HI SB2675 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Act 038, 04/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Act 038, 04/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Board of Dental Examiners, Hawaii Medical Board, Board of Nursing, and Board of Pharmacy to deny a license to an applicant or impose disciplinary action against a licensee who has been disciplined by another state or a federal agency. Prohibits a licensee from practicing until a final order of discipline is issued if the licensee has been prohibited from practicing in another state. (SB2675 HD2)
Title
Licensing; Reciprocal Discipline; Board of Dental Examiners; Hawaii Medical Board; Board of Nursing; Board of Pharmacy
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Senate | Act 038, 04/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138). |
2016-05-02 | House | Act 038, on 04/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138). |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, McKelvey, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Creagan, Tupola. |
2016-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 650). |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 20 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran, Slom, L. Thielen. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-15-16. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-15-16. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 564). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1692-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-31 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2016-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-31-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1308-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Oshiro. |
2016-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-16 at 2:00 PM. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-21-16 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Lowen, Say, Thielen, Tupola excused (5). |
2016-03-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1031-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-03-11 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola. |
2016-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-11-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 25 |
2016-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 65) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2556) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, K.Kahele, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Kim, Slom. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee on JDL has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2263) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-11-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2430 (Same As) 2016-02-03 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-05-16 9:15AM in conference room 329.