HI SB2702 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii aerospace development corporation to grow investments and job opportunities in the aerospace industry and for workforce development. Transfers all rights, powers, functions, and duties of the office of aerospace development and Pacific international space center for exploration systems to the Hawaii aerospace development corporation. Repeals the office of aerospace development and Pacific international space center for exploration systems. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Development Of The Aerospace Industry.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from ETT/PSM/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2494) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): none; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ihara, L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/PSM/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to ETT/PSM/GVO, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Established
Hawaii Aerospace Development Corporation
Office of Aerospace Development
Pacific International Space Center for Exploration Systems
Transfer
Hawaii Aerospace Development Corporation
Office of Aerospace Development
Pacific International Space Center for Exploration Systems
Transfer