HI SB2806 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to HSG, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to HSG, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the board of directors of the Hawaii public housing authority to set the executive director's compensation based on a comparability analysis, and other factors. (SD1)
Title
Public Housing; Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Executive Director Compensation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HSG, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 320) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2647) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2218) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-12 1:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2544 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 7