HI SB3012 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that each EUTF trustee, in addition to the EUTF board, shall administer health and other benefit plans for the sole and exclusive benefit of EUTF beneficiaries. Repeals provisions requiring health and other benefit plans to be provided at an affordable cost to both public employers and public employees.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2766) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1700 (Same As) 2020-05-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.