HI SB484 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB484
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to PSM/LBR, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to PSM/LBR, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the right for a representative of each county council to be present as a non-voting participant in negotiations with bargaining units if the relevant county has employees in the particular bargaining unit. Requires the mayor or mayor's representative to provide timely updates relating to bargaining unit negotiations to the county councils. Amends the number of votes allotted to the Governor for collective bargaining negotiations with units (11) and (12).
Title
Relating To Collective Bargaining.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/LBR, WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB332 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB484 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM.
SB484 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=484&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB484_.HTM |