HI SB571 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB571
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Require gas utility companies to establish renewable energy portfolio standards for gas. Provides means for gas utility companies to achieve the renewable energy portfolio standards for gas. Requires the public utilities commission to conduct a study of the renewable portfolio standards.
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1242 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
SB571 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
SB571 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=571&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB571_.HTM |