HI SB660 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB660
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the energy storage market acceleration program and energy storage rebate program to be administered by the public benefits fee administrator. Establishes an energy storage system rebate for energy storage system providers and allows for rebates under the program to be paid out of the public benefits fee. Requires the public utilities commission to establish rebate amounts under the program annually. Authorizes the public utilities commission to increase the public benefits fee if necessary to fund the programs. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Energy Storage.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from TRE/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 274) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, English, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE deferred the measure until 02-08-17 1:39PM in conference room 225. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE deferred the measure until 02-06-17 3:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRE/ETT, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB660 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.