HI SB660 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 233, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1335).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 233, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1335).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a non-compliant state identification card for individuals that are unable to provide an updated photograph and documentation in person as required by the REAL ID Act of 2005. (CD1)
Title
Relating To State Identification Cards.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 233, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1335). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 233, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1335). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 51) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 51). |
2019-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Morikawa, San Buenaventura, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Shimabukuro, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Morikawa, San Buenaventura, Thielen. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Deferred one day 04-04-19. |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey, Saiki, Todd excused (4). |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1914) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-18 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Yamane. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-19. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 209). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 815) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 268) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |