HI SCR100 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Collaborate With The Office Of Veterans' Services To Plan And Construct Memorials To Honor The Sacrifices And Contributions Of Veterans From Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Collaborate With The Office Of Veterans' Services To Plan And Construct Memorials To Honor The Sacrifices And Contributions Of Veterans From Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent. |
2023-04-28 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 992). |
2023-04-28 | House | Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 992). |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-28-23. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-28-23. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-25-23 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2023-04-25 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 981). |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 845). |
2023-04-24 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-24 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2246), recommending adoption. |
2023-04-19 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2023-04-17 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-19-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-04-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2). |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2203) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-04-14 | House | The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama, Alcos. |
2023-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Friday, 04-14-23 10:40AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-04-11 | House | Re-referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to CAI/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2023-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 547). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-23. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TCA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1489) with recommendation of adoption. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, McKelvey. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA/PSM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-23 3:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to TCA/PSM. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR114 (Same As) 2023-03-15 - Referred to CAI/CMV, referral sheet 20
SR110 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
SR110 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Subjects
Hawaii State Foundation on Culture and the Arts
Hawaii Veterans
Office of Veterans' Services
Public Memorials
Hawaii Veterans
Office of Veterans' Services
Public Memorials