HI SR110 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Collaborate With The Office Of Veterans' Services To Plan And Construct Memorials To Honor The Sacrifices And Contributions Of Veterans From Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Collaborate With The Office Of Veterans' Services To Plan And Construct Memorials To Honor The Sacrifices And Contributions Of Veterans From Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-23. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TCA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1490) with recommendation of adoption. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, McKelvey. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA/PSM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-23 3:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to TCA/PSM. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR120 (Same As) 2023-03-15 - Referred to CAI/CMV, referral sheet 20
SCR100 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
SCR100 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Subjects
Hawaii State Foundation on Culture and the Arts
Hawaii Veterans
Office of Veterans' Services
Public Memorials
Hawaii Veterans
Office of Veterans' Services
Public Memorials