HI SCR236 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR236
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging United States President Joseph R. Biden, Jr. And The Asia-pacific Economic Cooperation To Hold The 2023 Asiapacific Economic Cooperation Summit In Honolulu, Hawaii.
Title
Urging United States President Joseph R. Biden, Jr. And The Asia-pacific Economic Cooperation To Hold The 2023 Asiapacific Economic Cooperation Summit In Honolulu, Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1759) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-07 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-05 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 04-07-21 11:00AM in conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 586) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1487) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:05PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to LCA. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR236 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HCR44 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SR196 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR44 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SR196 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.