HI SCR41 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR41
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Broadband And Digital Equity Office To Conduct A Data Mapping Study To Identify Geographically Underserved And Unserved Areas In The State That Lack Quality Broadband Connectivity.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Broadband And Digital Equity Office To Conduct A Data Mapping Study To Identify Geographically Underserved And Unserved Areas In The State That Lack Quality Broadband Connectivity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-05-09 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 956). |
2022-05-09 | House | Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 956). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 05-05-22. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 05-05-22. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-26-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2022-04-26 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 916). |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 783). |
2022-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-25 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2160-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2022-04-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Kong, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi. |
2022-04-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-21-22 2:00PM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2). |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2032-22), recommending referral to CPC. |
2022-04-13 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Belatti, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Woodson, Okimoto. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 04-13-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to HET, CPC, referral sheet 47 |
2022-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 668) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3731) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to GVO. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR41 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32
SR36 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SR36 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Subjects
Broadband Connectivity
Data Mapping Survey
Hawaii Broadband and Digital Equity Office
Underserved Areas
Unserved Areas
Data Mapping Survey
Hawaii Broadband and Digital Equity Office
Underserved Areas
Unserved Areas