HI SR36 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR36
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Broadband And Digital Equity Office To Conduct A Data Mapping Study To Identify Geographically Underserved And Unserved Areas In The State That Lack Quality Broadband Connectivity.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Broadband And Digital Equity Office To Conduct A Data Mapping Study To Identify Geographically Underserved And Unserved Areas In The State That Lack Quality Broadband Connectivity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3732) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to GVO. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR36 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR41 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SCR41 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Subjects
Broadband Equity
Broadband Infrastructure and Service Map
Broadband Service
Data Collection
Hawaii Broadband and Digital Equity Office
Underserved Areas
Unserved Areas
Broadband Infrastructure and Service Map
Broadband Service
Data Collection
Hawaii Broadband and Digital Equity Office
Underserved Areas
Unserved Areas