HI SR105 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR105
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Monitor Compliance With The Federal Communications Commission Mandates For The Deployment Of Backup Power Generators For Wireless Communications Providers And Collect And Publish Data On Cellular Tower Backup Capacity.
Title
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Monitor Compliance With The Federal Communications Commission Mandates For The Deployment Of Backup Power Generators For Wireless Communications Providers And Collect And Publish Data On Cellular Tower Backup Capacity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1691) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR105 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
HR172 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR172 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Backup Power Source
Cellular Tower Backup Capacity
Power Resilience
Public Utilities Commission
Wireless Communications Provider
Cellular Tower Backup Capacity
Power Resilience
Public Utilities Commission
Wireless Communications Provider
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=105&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR105_.HTM |