IA HF201 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 739.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 739.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to tort liability, including employer liability and noneconomic damages in civil actions involving commercial motor vehicles, and punitive or exemplary damages in civil actions generally.(Formerly HSB 114.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to tort liability, including employer liability and noneconomic damages in civil actions involving commercial motor vehicles, and punitive or exemplary damages in civil actions generally.(Formerly HSB 114.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 739. |
2023-03-28 | House | SF 228 substituted. H.J. 738. |
2023-03-28 | House | Amendment H-1163 adopted. H.J. 738. |
2023-03-28 | House | Amendment H-1011 withdrawn. H.J. 738. |
2023-03-28 | House | Amendment H-1012 to amendment H-1011 withdrawn. H.J. 738. |
2023-03-27 | House | Amendment H-1163 filed. H.J. 736. |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 596. |
2023-02-07 | House | Amendment H-1012 filed. H.J. 263. |
2023-02-07 | House | Amendment H-1011 filed. H.J. 263. |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 247. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB114 (Related) 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 201.
SSB1114 (Related) 2023-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 228.
SF228 (Similar To) 2023-05-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1086.
SSB1114 (Related) 2023-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 228.
SF228 (Similar To) 2023-05-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1086.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF201 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF201.html |