IA HSB114 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF201
Note: Legislation replaced by SF228
Note: Legislation replaced by SF228
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 201.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 201.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to tort liability, including employer liability and noneconomic damages in civil actions involving commercial motor vehicles, and punitive or exemplary damages in civil actions generally.(See HF 201.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to tort liability, including employer liability and noneconomic damages in civil actions involving commercial motor vehicles, and punitive or exemplary damages in civil actions generally.(See HF 201.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 201. |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 243. |
2023-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2023 8:00AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee: Gustoff, Scheetz and Thompson, P. H.J. 208. |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 206. |
2023-01-30 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1114 (Related) 2023-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 228.
HF201 (Replaced by) 2023-03-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 739.
SF228 (Replaced by) 2023-05-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1086.
HF201 (Replaced by) 2023-03-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 739.
SF228 (Replaced by) 2023-05-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1086.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB114 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB114.html |