IL HB2932 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the provisions of Public Act 102-1116 that make amendatory changes to the Firearms Restraining Order Act that provide that a petitioner for a firearms restraining order may request a plenary firearms restraining order of up to one year, but not less than 6 months (restores the 6 months provision). Repeals provisions that the firearms restraining order may be renewed for an additional period of up to one year.
Title
FIREARM RESTRAIN ORDER-6 MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 67 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 67 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 67 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2932&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2932.htm |