IL HB3856 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Increases the threshold amount that enhances theft and retail theft from a misdemeanor to a felony or to a higher class of felony from $500 for theft and $300 for retail theft, and $150 for motor fuel theft to $2,500 other than for motor fuel theft, and $2,000 for motor fuel theft. Eliminates the offense of theft by emergency exit. Changes the threshold for criminal damage to property from $500 to $2,000. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-THEFT&DAMAGE PROPERTY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 16-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 16-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 21-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3856&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3856.htm |