KY HB52 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-10 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-10 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 95A.220 to define "stress injury" to include post-traumatic stress disorder; define scope of coverage; allow lifetime cap on benefits.
Title
AN ACT relating to firefighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 93 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 28, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-14 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2023-01-03 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-01-03 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Charter County Government
Cities
Consolidated Local Governments
Counties
Counties, Charter
Counties, Urban
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Local Government
Mental Health
Occupations and Professions
Unified Local Governments
Cities
Consolidated Local Governments
Counties
Counties, Charter
Counties, Urban
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Local Government
Mental Health
Occupations and Professions
Unified Local Governments