LA HB1008 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Interstate 10 as the "Louisiana Seafood Highway"
Title
Designates Interstate 10 as the "Louisiana Seafood Highway"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-04-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/12/2012. | |
2012-04-04 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-03 | Reported favorably (15-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-22 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2012-03-21 | Read by title. |