LA HB1086 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to contract limits for certain public contracts
Title
Provides relative to contract limits for certain public contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 1086 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1346) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1086 ADOPT (#1356) (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 1086 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1270) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1086 FINAL PASSAGE (#1166) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 1086 FINAL PASSAGE (#591) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1086 ADOPT (#1356) (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 1086 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1270) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1086 FINAL PASSAGE (#1166) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 1086 FINAL PASSAGE (#591) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 566. |
2016-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2016. |
2016-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2016-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 6 nays. |
2016-06-06 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2016-06-03 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Luneau, Cortez, and LaFleur. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2016-06-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Lance Harris, Havard, and Hall. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2016-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2016-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. |
2016-06-01 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016. |
2016-04-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2016-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-04-05 | House | Read by title. |