LA HB1121 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 07/01/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 07/01/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establish notification and reporting requirements relative to retail sales made in Louisiana by remote retailers (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Establish notification and reporting requirements relative to retail sales made in Louisiana by remote retailers (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 1121 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1272) (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1121 FINAL PASSAGE (#1217) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 1121 FINAL PASSAGE (#1052) (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 1121 FINAL PASSAGE (#968) (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1121 FINAL PASSAGE (#1217) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 1121 FINAL PASSAGE (#1052) (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 1121 FINAL PASSAGE (#968) (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2017. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 569. |
2016-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 2, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. |
2016-06-01 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 7 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 27. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-25 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-05-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2016. |
2016-05-24 | House | Notice given. |
2016-05-24 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2016-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 27. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. |
2016-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2016. |
2016-05-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-16 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2016-05-03 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-05-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, returned to the calendar. |
2016-05-02 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2016-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-04-05 | House | Read by title. |