LA HB127 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the penalties for the crime of simple obstruction of a highway of commerce (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX)
Title
Provides relative to the penalties for the crime of simple obstruction of a highway of commerce (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX)
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bayham [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 127 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1467) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 127 FINAL PASSAGE (#944) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Vote on HB 127 FINAL PASSAGE (#487) (Y: 71 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 127 FINAL PASSAGE (#944) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Vote on HB 127 FINAL PASSAGE (#487) (Y: 71 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 542. |
2024-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-28 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 82, nays 17, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/28/2024. |
2024-05-20 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 10 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-15 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2024. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported with amendments (9-4). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2024. |
2024-02-22 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-22 | House | Prefiled. |