LA HB14 | 2022 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 51-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 51-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the districts for the election of members to the House of Representatives (Item #1)
Title
Provides for the districts for the election of members to the House of Representatives (Item #1)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 14 FINAL PASSAGE (#49) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Vote on HB 14 FINAL PASSAGE (#32) (Y: 82 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Vote on HB 14 AMENDMENT # 113 BY GLOVER MOTION TO ADOPT (#31) (Y: 31 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-14 - House - House Vote on HB 14 AMENDMENT # 62 BY GLOVER MOTION TO ADOPT (#30) (Y: 31 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-14 - House - House Vote on HB 14 AMENDMENT # 90 BY GLOVER MOTION TO ADOPT (#29) (Y: 32 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-14 - House - House Vote on HB 14 FINAL PASSAGE (#32) (Y: 82 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Vote on HB 14 AMENDMENT # 113 BY GLOVER MOTION TO ADOPT (#31) (Y: 31 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-14 - House - House Vote on HB 14 AMENDMENT # 62 BY GLOVER MOTION TO ADOPT (#30) (Y: 31 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-14 - House - House Vote on HB 14 AMENDMENT # 90 BY GLOVER MOTION TO ADOPT (#29) (Y: 32 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2022-03-09 | House | Becomes Act No. 4 without the Governor's signature. |
2022-02-21 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-02-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-02-18 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-02-14 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 21. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-02-14 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/14/2022. |
2022-02-11 | House | Notice given. |
2022-02-11 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2022-02-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/11/2022. |
2022-02-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported with amendments (13-4). |
2022-02-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-02-04 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |