LA HB276 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for changes in the expenditure limit calculation (EG SEE FISC NOTE EX See Note)
Title
Provides for changes in the expenditure limit calculation (EG SEE FISC NOTE EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - House - House Vote on HB 276 FINAL PASSAGE (#653) (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Reported without action. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-24 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 21. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-24 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-24 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-24 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021. |
2021-05-19 | House | Notice given. |
2021-05-19 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-19 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2021. |
2021-05-18 | House | Notice given. |
2021-04-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2021. |
2021-04-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported with amendments (11-3). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-03-30 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-03-30 | House | Prefiled. |