LA HB29 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Vetoed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspends severance taxes on production from certain oil wells (Items #26 and 61) (EN -$10,375,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Suspends severance taxes on production from certain oil wells (Items #26 and 61) (EN -$10,375,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Vote on HB 29 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#216) (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 29 FINAL PASSAGE (#145) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - House - House Vote on HB 29 FINAL PASSAGE (#40) (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 29 FINAL PASSAGE (#145) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - House - House Vote on HB 29 FINAL PASSAGE (#40) (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2020-10-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-10-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-21 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 69, nays 17, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-10-21 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-10-20 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 10/21/20. |
2020-10-20 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-10-20 | House | Notice given. |
2020-10-20 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-20 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2020-10-06 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 22. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/06/20. |
2020-10-05 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-05 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-05 | House | Reported with amendments (14-2). |
2020-09-28 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |