LA HB328 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Becomes HB 1145.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Becomes HB 1145.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides sanctions for technical violations of drug division probation programs (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Title
Provides sanctions for technical violations of drug division probation programs (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Becomes HB 1145. |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported by substitute (11-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |