LA HB4 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to illegal possession of a handgun by a juvenile
Title
Provides relative to illegal possession of a handgun by a juvenile
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction. |
2021-01-28 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/28/2021. |
2021-01-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-01-25 | House | Prefiled. |