LA HB400 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-21 - Read by title. The Senate failed to approve consideration after the 57th calendar day by a vote of 19 yeas and 16 nays.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-21 - Read by title. The Senate failed to approve consideration after the 57th calendar day by a vote of 19 yeas and 16 nays.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to automobile liability insurance for rental dealers
Title
Provides with respect to automobile liability insurance for rental dealers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 400, 2/3 vote (#903) (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 400, QUORUM CALL (#902) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 400, FINAL PASSAGE (#117) (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 400, AMENDMENT # 23 BY ARNOLD, MOTION TO ADOPT (#106) (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 400, QUORUM CALL (#902) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 400, FINAL PASSAGE (#117) (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 400, AMENDMENT # 23 BY ARNOLD, MOTION TO ADOPT (#106) (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Read by title. The Senate failed to approve consideration after the 57th calendar day by a vote of 19 yeas and 16 nays. | |
2011-06-19 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2011-06-19 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-14 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-09 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-08 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2011-05-12 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2011-05-11 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 5. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-11 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-05-11 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/11/2011. | |
2011-05-05 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-04 | Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular). | |
2011-05-03 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2011-05-02 | Reported without action, (15-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2011-04-26 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2011-04-26 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. |