LA HB409 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 06/17/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 06/17/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the transfer, deposit, and use of monies among state funds (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the transfer, deposit, and use of monies among state funds (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 409 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1366) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 409 ADOPT (#1370) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 409 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1276) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 409 FINAL PASSAGE (#1252) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 409 FINAL PASSAGE (#775) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 409 ADOPT (#1370) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 409 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1276) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 409 FINAL PASSAGE (#1252) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 409 FINAL PASSAGE (#775) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 06/17/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 601. |
2016-06-08 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/8/2016. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 5. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2016-06-06 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2016-06-03 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: LaFleur, Alario, and Peacock. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2016-06-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Henry, Barras, and Hodges. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2016-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2016-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. |
2016-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-12 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 3 for 05/13/2016. |
2016-05-12 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-05-10 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 4 for 05/12/2016. |
2016-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-05-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-09 | House | Reported with amendments (23-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |