LA HB45 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires third-party logistics providers to obtain controlled dangerous substance licenses (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Title
Requires third-party logistics providers to obtain controlled dangerous substance licenses (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 45 FINAL PASSAGE (#852) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote on HB 45 FINAL PASSAGE (#41) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote on HB 45 FINAL PASSAGE (#41) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 186. |
2018-05-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-19 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/19/18. |
2018-03-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-14 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-02-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/2/2018. |
2018-01-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-01-31 | House | Prefiled. |