LA HB45 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for fines associated with selling vapor products to persons under the age of 18 (RE INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides for fines associated with selling vapor products to persons under the age of 18 (RE INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 45 FINAL PASSAGE (#497) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19. |
2019-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0-1). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-03-08 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/8/2019. |
2019-03-07 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-03-07 | House | Prefiled. |