LA HB45 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Effective date: 06/30/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Effective date: 06/30/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Re-creates the Department of State and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law
Title
Re-creates the Department of State and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 45 FINAL PASSAGE (#536) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Vote on HB 45 FINAL PASSAGE (#45) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Vote on HB 45 FINAL PASSAGE (#45) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Effective date: 06/30/2022. |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 20. |
2022-05-13 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-12 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-03-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-03-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/23/2022. |
2022-03-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-17 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-02-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/4/2022. |
2022-02-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-02-03 | House | Prefiled. |