LA HB453 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the statute of limitations to prosecute the crime of molestation of a juvenile
Title
Eliminates the statute of limitations to prosecute the crime of molestation of a juvenile
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 453 FINAL PASSAGE (#1395) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 453 FINAL PASSAGE (#1124) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 453 FINAL PASSAGE (#1124) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-19 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 698. |
2024-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2024. |
2024-05-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-14 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |