LA HB488 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to blockchain and digital asset regulation
Title
Provides relative to blockchain and digital asset regulation
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 488 ADOPT (#1479) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 488 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1759) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 488 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1381) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#1062) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#163) (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#163) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 488 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1759) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 488 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1381) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#1062) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#163) (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#163) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-19 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 700. |
2024-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2024. |
2024-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-06-03 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2024-06-03 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2024-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-31 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2024. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2024-05-30 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-05-28 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Coussan, Mizell, and Morris. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2024-05-23 | House | House conferees appointed: Wright, Deshotel, and Carver. |
2024-05-23 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2024-05-23 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/23/2024. |
2024-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 104, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/2024. |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |