LA HB506 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative voter registration applications collected through registration drives
Title
Provides relative voter registration applications collected through registration drives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 506 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1661) (Y: 70 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 506 FINAL PASSAGE (#1309) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 506 FINAL PASSAGE (#133) (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 506 SUSPEND THE RULES (#132) (Y: 38 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 506 FINAL PASSAGE (#1309) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 506 FINAL PASSAGE (#133) (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 506 SUSPEND THE RULES (#132) (Y: 38 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-19 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 701. |
2024-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-30 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 70, nays 19, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-30 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/30/2024. |
2024-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-28 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 27. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/27/2024. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (8-6). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |