LA HB64 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date: 07/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date: 07/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the ancillary expenses of state government
Title
Provides for the ancillary expenses of state government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 64 ADOPT (#968) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 64 MOTION TO ADOPT (#957) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 64 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#823) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 64 HB 64 BY HENRY (#789) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 64 FINAL PASSAGE (#167) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 64 MOTION TO ADOPT (#957) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 64 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#823) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 64 HB 64 BY HENRY (#789) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 64 FINAL PASSAGE (#167) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Effective date: 07/01/17. |
2017-06-26 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 48. |
2017-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017. |
2017-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: LaFleur, Allain, and Hewitt. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2017-06-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Henry, Schroder, and Barras. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2017-06-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-01 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 2 for 05/04/17. |
2017-05-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (19-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-03-17 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/17/2017. |
2017-03-15 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-03-15 | House | Prefiled. |