LA HB708 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirements that charter schools meet a certain threshold with respect to the number of students with exceptionalities and economically disadvantaged students relative to its total student enrollment
Title
Removes requirements that charter schools meet a certain threshold with respect to the number of students with exceptionalities and economically disadvantaged students relative to its total student enrollment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 708 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1582) (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 708 FINAL PASSAGE (#1251) (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 708 AMENDMENT # 4181 BY LAMBERT HB 708 BY FREIBERG (#1250) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 708 FINAL PASSAGE (#149) (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 708 SUSPEND THE RULES (#148) (Y: 39 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 708 FINAL PASSAGE (#1251) (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 708 AMENDMENT # 4181 BY LAMBERT HB 708 BY FREIBERG (#1250) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 708 FINAL PASSAGE (#149) (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 708 SUSPEND THE RULES (#148) (Y: 39 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-18 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 659. |
2024-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-30 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 6, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-28 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/2024. |
2024-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 7 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 33. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/27/2024. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |