LA HB792 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to literacy instruction and reading support services for certain students in grades six through 12 (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to literacy instruction and reading support services for certain students in grades six through 12 (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Tammy Phelps [D] | Rep. Delisha Boyd [D] | Rep. Mandie Landry [D] | Rep. Pat Moore [D] |
Rep. Candace Newell [D] | Sen. Regina Barrow [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 792 FINAL PASSAGE (#1257) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-26 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-05-10 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |