LA HB8 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the expenses of the legislature for Fiscal Year 2020-2021 (Item #3)
Title
Makes appropriations for the expenses of the legislature for Fiscal Year 2020-2021 (Item #3)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - House - House Vote on HB 8 MOTION TO ADOPT (#182) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 8 ADOPT (#161) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - House Vote on HB 8 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#144) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#135) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#16) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 8 ADOPT (#161) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - House Vote on HB 8 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#144) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#135) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#16) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2020. |
2020-07-08 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 8. |
2020-07-01 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-30 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2020-06-30 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2020-06-30 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-06-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/30/20. |
2020-06-29 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2020-06-29 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2020-06-29 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Cortez, White, and Tarver. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2020-06-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2020-06-29 | House | House conferees appointed: Schexnayder, Zeringue, and Dustin Miller. |
2020-06-28 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/29/20. |
2020-06-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 06/26. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-06-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-06-05 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 4 for 06/10/20. |
2020-06-05 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-06-05 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). |
2020-06-01 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |