LA HB813 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-22 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 21, nays 76. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-22 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 21, nays 76. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to licensing fees for vocational rehabilitation counselors
Title
Provides relative to licensing fees for vocational rehabilitation counselors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 813 FINAL PASSAGE (#409) (Y: 21 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 21, nays 76. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. |
2020-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2020-05-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-03-31 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |