LA HCR156 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests that the state Dept. of Education and public school governing authorities implement certain measures based on the La. Women's Policy and Research Commission's recommendations pertaining to science, technology, engineering, and math (STEM) education in its 2013 report to the governor
Title
Requests that the state Dept. of Education and public school governing authorities implement certain measures based on the La. Women's Policy and Research Commission's recommendations pertaining to science, technology, engineering, and math (STEM) education in its 2013 report to the governor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 156 ADOPT (#1684) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - House Vote on HCR 156 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1452) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - House - House Vote on HCR 156 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1452) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-06-01 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 85, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-29 | House | Rules suspended. |
2014-05-29 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-05-29 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Education. |
2014-05-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2014-05-13 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |