LA HCR19 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Lutcher High School Bulldogs football team on winning the Louisiana High School Athletic Association 2022 Non-Select Division II state championship
Title
Commends the Lutcher High School Bulldogs football team on winning the Louisiana High School Athletic Association 2022 Non-Select Division II state championship
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R] | Rep. Ken Brass [D] | Sen. Gregory Miller [R] | Sen. Eddie Lambert [R] |
Sen. Edward Price [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 19 CONCUR (#31) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-04-20 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-04-19 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-04-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |