LA HCR200 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Emma Purifoy of Ruston upon being named Louisiana Elementary Student of the Year
Title
Commends Emma Purifoy of Ruston upon being named Louisiana Elementary Student of the Year
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Shadoin [R] | Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D] | Sen. Richard Gallot [D] | Sen. Robert Kostelka [R] |
Sen. Michael Walsworth [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 200 ADOPT (#1494) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-05-27 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |