LA HCR76 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Tuesday, April 26, 2016, as Kingsley House Day at the legislature
Title
Designates Tuesday, April 26, 2016, as Kingsley House Day at the legislature
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 76 ADOPT (#315) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-04-20 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-14 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |