LA HCR78 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-21-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-21-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to Louisiana broadband maps to identify access and activation gaps
Title
Provides relative to Louisiana broadband maps to identify access and activation gaps
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HCR 78 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#639) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 78 ADOPT (#319) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 78 HCR 78 BY MR. SPEAKER (#201) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 78 ADOPT (#319) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 78 HCR 78 BY MR. SPEAKER (#201) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-05-27 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20. |
2020-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-18 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2020-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2020-05-07 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |