LA HCR83 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health to create a task force to study, identify, and make recommendations to address the specialist physician shortage in the state
Title
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health to create a task force to study, identify, and make recommendations to address the specialist physician shortage in the state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 83 CONCUR (#924) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Vote on HCR 83 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#581) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Vote on HCR 83 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#581) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-23 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 88, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2023. |
2023-05-17 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-16 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2023-05-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2023-05-09 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |