LA HCR96 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests public postsecondary education institutions offering baccalaureate degrees to develop and promote plans for completion of such degrees in three years
Title
Requests public postsecondary education institutions offering baccalaureate degrees to develop and promote plans for completion of such degrees in three years
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 96 ADOPT (#1478) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - House Vote on HCR 96 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1193) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - House Vote on HCR 96 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1193) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-05-27 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 86, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2014. |
2014-05-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2014-04-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2014-04-21 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |