LA HR45 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs state agencies and licensing boards to suspend the imposition of sanctions against licensees and permittees for a violation of COVID-19 executive orders
Title
Directs state agencies and licensing boards to suspend the imposition of sanctions against licensees and permittees for a violation of COVID-19 executive orders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HR 45 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#779) (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 63, nays 30. The resolution was adopted. |
2020-06-01 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-06-01 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |