LA SB104 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for board membership and authority of certain state museums.
Title
Provides for board membership and authority of certain state museums.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 104 ADOPT (#731) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 104 MOTION TO ADOPT (#790) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 104 REJECT (#633) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 104 FINAL PASSAGE (#577) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 104 FINAL PASSAGE (#240) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 104 MOTION TO ADOPT (#790) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 104 REJECT (#633) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 104 FINAL PASSAGE (#577) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 104 FINAL PASSAGE (#240) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 212. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020. |
2020-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2020-06-01 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2020-06-01 | House | House conferees appointed: Edmonds, Huval, and Bacala. |
2020-06-01 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Milligan, Tarver, and Womack. |
2020-05-31 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20. |
2020-05-28 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-28 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-28 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-28 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |